Sergio Lasam Utleg, D.D., (born in Solana, Cagayan, September 11, 1943), is a prelate of the Roman Catholic Church in the Philippines. He is the former Archbishop of Tuguegarao in Tuguegarao, Philippines. On October 18, 2024, his resignation was accepted by Pope Francis, appointing Alaminos … See more The Most Rev. Sergio Lasam Utleg, D.D. or fondly called as "Ama Enjoe" was born 11 September 1943 in Solana, Cagayana (Philippines). He received his Philosophical and Theological Studies at the UST Central … See more On June 16, 2011, Pope Benedict XVI has elevated Laoag Bishop Sergio Utleg to Archbishop of Tuguegarao replacing retiring Archbishop Diosdado Talamayan. His resignation was … See more Lifted from the Souvenir Program “ The Rite of Liturgical Reception, Eucharistic Celebration and Canonical Possession of the Archdiocese of Tuguegarao” His Excellency The … See more WebBishop Miguel Gatan Purugganan † Bishop of Ilagan. Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession: Archbishop Gian Vincenzo Moreni † (1982) Titular Archbishop of Turris in …
Metropolitan Archdiocese of Tuguegarao, Philippines - GCatholic
WebBishop Danilo Bangayan Ulep (born 24 Jun 1962 ) Prelate of Batanes. Ad Limina - May 2024: Bishop. Event. Place. Birth Place. Tuguegarao City, Archdiocese of Tuguegarao. … WebOct 19, 2024 · Pope Francis on Friday (Oct. 18, 2024) names Bishop Ricardo Baccay as the new archbishop of the diocese of Tuguegarao. Baccay, who will replace Archbishop Sergio Utleg, served as the auxiliary bishop of the archdiocese in 2007 until he was transferred to the Diocese of Alaminos in Pangasinan in 2016. (Photo courtesy of the … fish church gothenburg
Bishops of the Philippines CBCP Online
WebMikuláš Tóth (bishop) Mikuláš Tóth ( Ukrainian: Микола Товт; 10 August 1833 – 21 May 1882) was a Slovak Greek Catholic hierarch. He was the bishop of Slovak Catholic … WebOct 7, 2010 · Homily delivered by Archbishop Socrates B. Villegas, DD on the occasion of his silver jubilee as priest held at the Cathedral of Saint John the Evangelist, Dagupan City last October 6, 2010 at 10:00 o’clock in the morning. WebNov 4, 2009 · Archbishop Socrates Villegas was ordained priest by then Manila Archbishop Jaime Cardinal Sin in October 5, 1985. He was appointed Auxiliary Bishop of Manila in July 25, 2001, and ordained Bishop and Titular of Nona in August 31, 2001. He was appointed Bishop of Balanga (Bataan) in May 3, 2004 and installed in July 3, 2004. fish chunks recipes